VA HB2295 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; definition of cider. Creates two classes of cider by defining it as any beverage, carbonated or otherwise, obtained by the fermentation of the natural sugar content of apples (i) containing not more than 10 percent of alcohol by volume without chaptalization or (ii) containing not more than seven percent of alcohol by volume regardless of chaptalization. The bill defines "chaptalization" as a method of increasing the alcohol in a wine by adding sugar to the must before or during fermentation. The expanded definition of cider is to take into account the natural sweetness of certain Virginia apples.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; definition of chaptalization and cider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 265 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2295ER) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Printed as engrossed 11101932D-E | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2295E | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101932D |