VA HB2292 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health records; electronic access. Provides that health records, disclosure of which has been authorized by a patient or as otherwise allowed by state law, shall be made available electronically but only to the extent and in the manner authorized by federal law, except that a health care entity shall not be obligated to provide records in the electronic format requested if (i) the electronic format is not reasonably available without additional cost to the health care entity, (ii) the records would be subject to modification in the format requested, or (iii) the health care entity determines that the integrity of the records could be compromised in the electronic format requested.
Title
Health records; electronic access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2292ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2292H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104612D-H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104612D-H1 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102184D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |