VA HB2290 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2290
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Punishment for conviction of second or subsequent misdemeanor larceny; repeal. Repeals the enhanced penalties for a second or subsequent misdemeanor larceny conviction. Under current law, when a person is convicted of a second larceny offense, he shall be confined in jail not less than 30 days nor more than 12 months, and for a third, or any subsequent offense, he shall be guilty of a Class 6 felony.
Title
Larceny; repeals punishment for conviction of second or subsequent misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2290ER) |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Pending question ordered |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21101450D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2290 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)