VA HB2290 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Punishment for conviction of second or subsequent misdemeanor larceny; repeal. Repeals the enhanced penalties for a second or subsequent misdemeanor larceny conviction. Under current law, when a person is convicted of a second larceny offense, he shall be confined in jail not less than 30 days nor more than 12 months, and for a third, or any subsequent offense, he shall be guilty of a Class 6 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Larceny; repeals punishment for conviction of second or subsequent misdemeanor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 45-N)
2021-02-01HousePending question ordered
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-15HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 21101450D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182104(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback