VA HB2290 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver education programs; instruction concerning traffic stops. Requires each driver education program in the public school system to include instruction concerning traffic stops, including law-enforcement procedures for traffic stops, appropriate actions to be taken by drivers during traffic stops, and appropriate interactions with law-enforcement officers who initiate traffic stops. The bill requires the Board of Education to collaborate with the Department of State Police in implementing the changes to its driver education program.
Title
Driver education programs; instruction concerning traffic stops.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N) (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N) (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2290ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103451D |