VA HB2275 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Spousal support and separate maintenance. Provides that in any proceeding on the issue of determining spousal support or separate maintenance, the court shall have the authority to order a party to (i) maintain any existing life insurance policy on his life provided the party so ordered has the right to designate a beneficiary and (ii) designate the other party as the beneficiary of such life insurance for so long as the party so ordered has an obligation to pay spousal support to the other party.
Title
Spousal support; court shall have authority to order party to maintain existing life insurance.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2011-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102785D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2275 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2275+hil |