VA HB2272 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Norfolk State University and Virginia State University; reduced rate tuition charges for certain students. Permits the Norfolk State University Board of Visitors and the Virginia State University Board of Visitors to charge reduced rate tuition to any non-Virginia student who has completed at least 30 credit hours of coursework and is enrolled in a program at the relevant institution that leads to employment in a high-demand field, as determined by the board of visitors of the relevant institution based on data compiled and provided by the Virginia Office of Education Economics. The bill provides that in the event that a non-Virginia student who was charged reduced rate tuition at the relevant institution in accordance with the provisions of the bill withdraws from the program that leads to employment in a high-demand field and enrolls in a program that does not lead to employment in a high-demand field, such student will forfeit eligibility for such reduced rate tuition charge and shall be charged tuition at the full rate for non-Virginia students. The bill further provides that any non-Virginia student at Norfolk State University or Virginia State University who was initially enrolled in a program that does not lead to employment in a high-demand field but withdraws from that program and enrolls in a program that does lead to employment in a high-demand field may be charged reduced rate tuition in accordance with the provisions of the bill.
Title
Norfolk State University & Va. State University; reduced rate tuition charges for certain students.
Sponsors
Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] | Del. AC Cordoza [R] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2272ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2023-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Locke, Suetterlein |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Cherry, Batten, McQuinn |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 23107054D-S1 (0-Y 96-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2272S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23107054D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23107054D-S1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2272H2 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 23105991D-H2 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee on Education substitute rejected 23105577D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105991D-H2 |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105577D-H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103113D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1448 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
SB1448 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
SB1448 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Subjects
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Norfolk State University
Tuition
Virginia State University
Norfolk State University
Tuition
Virginia State University