VA HB2267 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitals; drawing of certain blood samples. Directs the Board of Health to amend regulations governing hospitals to require each hospital to which funds are appropriated in any general appropriation act to collect blood samples from patients who are unwilling or unable to provide consent to the collection of such samples when such samples are required by a valid search warrant.
Title
Hospitals; drawing of certain blood samples.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102717D |