VA HB2263 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2263
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abolition of the death penalty. Abolishes the death penalty, including for those persons currently under a death sentence. The bill provides that no person may be sentenced to death or put to death on or after its effective date for any violation of law.
Title
Death penalty; abolition of current penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Stanley rejected 21200391D-S1 (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Stanley rejected 21200391D-S1 (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 344 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2263ER) |
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Stanley rejected 21200391D-S1 (18-Y 21-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21200391D-S1 (Stanley) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Pending question ordered |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2263H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Pending question ordered |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104346D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Incorporates HB1779 (Carter) |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104346D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21101951D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1779 (Similar To)
HB1779 (Similar To)
HB2263 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
SB1165 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
SB1165 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
HB1779 (Similar To)
HB2263 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
SB1165 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
SB1165 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
Subjects
Appropriations
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Death Penalty
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Death Penalty
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 157 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 159 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 163.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 169.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 217.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 247 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 270.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 295.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 299 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 299.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 321.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 327.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 327.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 327.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 71 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 76.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 229 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 232 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 654 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 654.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 654.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |