VA HB2263 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Abolition of the death penalty. Abolishes the death penalty, including for those persons currently under a death sentence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death penalty; abolition of current penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N)
2021-02-05HousePending question ordered
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2263H1
2021-02-04HousePending question ordered
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104346D-H1
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseIncorporates HB1779 (Carter)
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104346D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-28HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 21101951D

Same As/Similar To

HB1779 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
HB1779 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171310(n/a)See Bill Text
171313(n/a)See Bill Text
171406(n/a)See Bill Text
18210(n/a)See Bill Text
18217(n/a)See Bill Text
18218(n/a)See Bill Text
18219(n/a)See Bill Text
18222(n/a)See Bill Text
18225(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.01(n/a)See Bill Text
18226(n/a)See Bill Text
18230(n/a)See Bill Text
18231(n/a)See Bill Text
18232(n/a)See Bill Text
1828(n/a)See Bill Text
192100(n/a)See Bill Text
192102(n/a)See Bill Text
19211.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192120(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192157(n/a)See Bill Text
192159(n/a)See Bill Text
192163(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.7(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.8(n/a)See Bill Text
192169.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192175(n/a)See Bill Text
192217.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192247(n/a)See Bill Text
192264.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192264.5(n/a)See Bill Text
192270.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192295.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192299(n/a)See Bill Text
192299.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192311(n/a)See Bill Text
192319(n/a)See Bill Text
192321.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.11(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192389.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192389.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192400(n/a)See Bill Text
19271(n/a)See Bill Text
19276.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
531204(n/a)See Bill Text
531229(n/a)See Bill Text
531230(n/a)See Bill Text
531232(n/a)See Bill Text
531236(n/a)See Bill Text
5413307(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.10(n/a)See Bill Text
801654(n/a)See Bill Text
801654.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801654.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2263
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2263+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2263H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21104106.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104346D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2263F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2263F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2263FH1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2263FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801V0046+HB2263
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0145+HB2263
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1505+HB2263
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0147+HB2263

Bill Comments

feedback