VA HB2251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; optional defined contribution retirement plan. Requires the Virginia Retirement System (VRS) to establish an optional defined contribution retirement plan for state and local employees. Participation in the plan is in lieu of other retirement plans offered by VRS. Employees hired on or after July 1, 2019, shall make an irrevocable election whether to participate in the plan. A person who is employed on June 30, 2019, shall make an irrevocable election by October 31, 2019, to participate in the new retirement plan beginning January 1, 2020, in lieu of his retirement plan at the time. If such employee elects to participate in the new plan, his retirement plan at the time of election will be "frozen" and not increase because of compensation earned or years of service earned while participating in the new plan. Under the plan, the employer makes a mandatory contribution in the amount of 8.5 percent of the employee's compensation, and the employee contributes five percent of his compensation. The employer's contribution becomes fully vested upon the employee's completion of five years of continuous participation.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; establishes an optional defined contribution retirement plan.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-25 | House | Failed to pass |
2017-02-25 | House | No further action taken |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Jones, Massie, Torian |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2251H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105158D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105158D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103357D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 1 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1131.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1153 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1161 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1169 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1172 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1178 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1183 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 124.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 306.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |