VA HB2237 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the State Inspector General; extension of jurisdiction to local departments of social services. Extends the jurisdiction of the Office of the State Inspector General by amending the definition of "state agency" to include any local department of social services.
Title
State Inspector General, Office of the; "state agency" includes any local dept. of social services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 590 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB2237ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2237ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate receded from amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103056D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2237E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103056D |