VA HB2221 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting selling, etc., of firearms to certain persons; penalty. Adds persons found legally incompetent or mentally incapacitated, persons involuntarily admitted to a mental health facility or sent for involuntary outpatient mental health treatment, and those who were the subject of a temporary detention order and subsequently agreed to voluntary admission to a mental health facility to the list of persons for whom it is a Class 6 felony to sell, barter, give, or furnish a firearm if the seller knows that the person is prohibited from possessing or transporting a firearm.
Title
Firearms; prohibiting selling, etc., to certain persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103879D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2221 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2221+hil |