VA HB2219 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Utility-scale solar energy facilities. Declares that the construction by Appalachian Power or Dominion Virginia Power of utility-scale solar energy facilities with an aggregate rated capacity that does not exceed 500 megawatts is in the public interest. The bill authorizes these utilities to petition the State Corporation Commission for a certificate of public convenience and necessity to construct such a facility that has a rated capacity of not less than 20 megawatts, regardless of whether the facility will be located in the utility's service territory. The costs of the facility are recoverable through a rate adjustment clause, provided that the total rated capacity added by these facilities does not exceed 500 megawatts. The measure sunsets on January 1, 2019.
Title
Utility-scale solar energy facilities; construction of facilities to be in the public interest.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103061D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2219 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2219+hil |