VA HB2218 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2218
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmaceutical processors; cannabis products. Permits pharmaceutical processors to produce and distribute cannabis products other than cannabis oil and for that purpose defines the terms "botanical cannabis," "cannabis product," and "usable cannabis." The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to establish testing standards for botanical cannabis and botanical cannabis products, establish a registration process for botanical cannabis products, and promulgate emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill provides that if a practitioner determines it is consistent with the standard of care to dispense botanical cannabis to a minor, the written certification shall specifically authorize such dispensing. The bill allows the Board of Pharmacy to assess and collect botanical cannabis regulatory fees to cover costs associated with the implementation of the provisions of the bill, including costs for new personnel, training, promulgation of regulations and guidance documents, and information technology. The bill exempts the Board of Pharmacy's acquisition of a commercially available cannabis-specific software product to implement the provisions of the bill from the Virginia Public Procurement Act.
Title
Pharmaceutical processors; permits processors to produce & distribute cannabis products.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 7-N 2-A) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 227 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2218ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 7-N 2-A) |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200081D-S1 (90-Y 7-N 2-A) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2218S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200081D-S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200081D-S1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2218H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103713D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103713D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102492D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2218 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
SB1333 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
SB1333 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
SB1333 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
SB1333 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |