VA HB2218 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmaceutical processors; cannabis products. Permits pharmaceutical processors to produce and distribute cannabis products other than cannabis oil. The bill defines the terms "botanical cannabis," "cannabis product," and "usable cannabis." The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to establish testing standards for botanical cannabis and botanical cannabis products, establish a registration process for botanical cannabis products, and promulgate emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill allows the Board of Pharmacy to assess and collect a one-time botanical cannabis regulatory fee from each pharmaceutical processor, not to exceed $75,000, to cover costs associated with the implementation of the provisions of the bill, including costs for new personnel, training, promulgation of regulations and guidance documents, and information technology. Pharmaceutical processors; cannabis products. Permits pharmaceutical processors to produce and distribute cannabis products other than cannabis oil. The bill defines the terms "botanical cannabis," "cannabis product," and "usable cannabis." The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to establish testing standards for botanical cannabis and botanical cannabis products, establish a registration process for botanical cannabis products, and promulgate emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill allows the Board of Pharmacy to assess and collect a one-time botanical cannabis regulatory fee from each pharmaceutical processor, not to exceed $75,000, to cover costs associated with the implementation of the provisions of the bill, including costs for new personnel, training, promulgation of regulations and guidance documents, and information technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical processors; permits processors to produce & distribute cannabis products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 3-N 2-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 3-N 2-A)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2218H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103713D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103713D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102492D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412519(n/a)See Bill Text
5412521(n/a)See Bill Text
5412903(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2218
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2218+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2218H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103713D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103713.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2218F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2218FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1202V0011+HB2218
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0094+HB2218
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1396+HB2218
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0124+HB2218

Bill Comments 750

feedback