VA HB2212 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Healthy Transitions Program. Establishes the Virginia Healthy Transitions Program to reduce the number of uninsured individuals in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Healthy Transitions Program; established, report.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-11HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2015-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-20HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2015-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2015-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 15103464D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321370(n/a)See Bill Text
321371(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback