VA HB2200 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Computers; facilitating certain offenses involving children. Revises for clarity the terms used to describe offenders and victims in the section criminalizing use of a communications system to solicit sexual activity with children. The bill states that it is declarative of existing law.
Title
Computers; facilitating certain offenses involving children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101008D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2200 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2200+hil |