VA HB22 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0309)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0309)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mandatory water and sewer connections; Powhatan County; Smyth County. Adds Powhatan County and Smyth County to the list of counties that may require connection to their water and sewer systems by owners of property that can be served by the systems if the property, at the time of installation of such public system, or at a future time, does not have a then-existing, correctable, or replaceable domestic supply or source of potable water and a then-existing, correctable, or replaceable system for the disposal of sewage adequate to prevent the contraction or spread of infectious, contagious, and dangerous diseases. Smyth County is also added to those counties with authority to assume the obligations of a public service authority under the same terms and conditions as applicable to the public service authority.
Title
Water and sewer connections; mandatory in Powhatan County.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0309) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 309 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB22ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101211D-E |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB22E |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendments by Delegate Campbell agreed to |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101211D |