VA HB2198 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2198
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local elections for governing bodies; elections for school boards; qualification of voters. Provides that in a locality that imposes district-based or ward-based residency requirements for members of the governing body or school board, the member elected from each district or ward is to be elected by the qualified voters of that district or ward and not by the locality at large. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Local elections for governing bodies; elections for school boards; qualification of voters. Provides that in a locality that imposes district-based or ward-based residency requirements for members of the governing body or school board, the member elected from each district or ward is to be elected by the qualified voters of that district or ward and not by the locality at large. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Local elections for governing bodies; elections for school boards, qualification of voters.
Sponsors
Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator DeSteph rejected 21200645D-S1 (18-Y 20-N) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator DeSteph rejected 21200645D-S1 (18-Y 20-N) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 225 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2198ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Substitute by Senator DeSteph rejected 21200645D-S1 (18-Y 20-N) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21200645D-S1 (DeSteph) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2198H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103129D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Substitute bill reprinted 21103129D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103129D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Voting Rights |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102650D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2198 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Education
Elections
Local Government and Officials
School Boards
Voters and Voting
Education
Elections
Local Government and Officials
School Boards
Voters and Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 222 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |