VA HB2198 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Local elections for governing bodies; elections for school boards; qualification of voters. Provides that in a locality that imposes district-based or ward-based residency requirements for members of the governing body or school board, the member elected from each district or ward is to be elected by the qualified voters of that district or ward and not by the locality at large. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Local elections for governing bodies; elections for school boards; qualification of voters. Provides that in a locality that imposes district-based or ward-based residency requirements for members of the governing body or school board, the member elected from each district or ward is to be elected by the qualified voters of that district or ward and not by the locality at large. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local elections for governing bodies; elections for school boards, qualification of voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2198H1
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103129D-H1
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseSubstitute bill reprinted 21103129D-H1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103129D-H1
2021-01-27HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Voting Rights
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102650D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521400(n/a)See Bill Text
242218(n/a)See Bill Text
242222(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2198
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2198+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2198H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103129D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103129.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2198F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2198FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1806V0004+HB2198
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H18V0024+HB2198
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1312+HB2198
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S08V0070+HB2198

Bill Comments

feedback