VA HB2190 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Wrongful death beneficiaries. Provides that an award in a wrongful death action, where there is no surviving spouse of the decedent, children of the decedent, or children of a deceased child of the decedent, shall be distributed to the parents, brothers and sisters of the decedent, and any other family member who is primarily dependent on the decedent and the same member of the decedent's household.
Title
Wrongful death; beneficiaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100833D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2190 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)