VA HB2190 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2190

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Wrongful death beneficiaries. Provides that an award in a wrongful death action, where there is no surviving spouse of the decedent, children of the decedent, or children of a deceased child of the decedent, shall be distributed to the parents, brothers and sisters of the decedent, and any other relative who is primarily dependent on the decedent for support or services and is also a member of the same household as the decedent. Wrongful death beneficiaries. Provides that an award in a wrongful death action, where there is no surviving spouse of the decedent, children of the decedent, or children of a deceased child of the decedent, shall be distributed to the parents, brothers and sisters of the decedent, and any other relative who is primarily dependent on the decedent for support or services and is also a member of the same household as the decedent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wrongful death; beneficiaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2190ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 21104456D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2190S1
2021-02-22SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104456D-S1
2021-02-22SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104456D-S1
2021-02-12SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100833D

Same As/Similar To

HB2190 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80153(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2190
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2190+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2190S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2190ER+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104456D.pdf
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0802C0016+HB2190
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H08C0110+HB2190
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1284+HB2190
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0162+HB2190
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0046+HB2190
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2190+HB2190
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0266HB2190+HB2190
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1888+HB2190

Bill Comments

feedback