VA HB2185 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Submission of onsite soil evaluations for permits or letters for sewage systems. Provides that the Department of Health shall require submission of onsite soil evaluations with every application for a permit or letter for any onsite sewage or alternative discharging sewage system, but authorizes the Department to waive such requirement for applicants whose incomes are below the federal poverty guidelines.
Title
Sewage systems; submission of onsite soil evaluations for permits or letters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #4 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100935D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 163.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 163.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 164 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2185 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2185+hil |