VA HB2174 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; awards of compensation. Provides that wages paid to an employee who is physically unable to return to his pre-injury work due to a compensable injury and who is provided work within his capacity at a wage equal to or greater than his pre-injury wage shall be considered compensation paid pursuant to an award for compensation but shall not result in a reduction of the maximum number of weeks of compensation benefits. Any award of compensation may be reviewed by the Workers' Compensation Commission.
Title
Workers' compensation; Commission may review any award of compensation, compensation benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 445 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2174ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103682D |