VA HB2164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; definitions; small business. Redefines "small business" for the purposes of programs for the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity and the Virginia Public Procurement Act to mean a business that together with its affiliates has both 250 or fewer employees and average annual gross receipts, less the cost of goods sold by the business, of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years. Currently for these programs, a business qualifies as a small business if, together with its affiliates, it has either 250 or fewer employees or average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years.
Title
Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; redefines "small business."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102026D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |