VA HB2151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Resources Authority. Transfers the responsibility for the Virginia Resources Authority from the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to the Secretary of Finance. This bill is identical to SB 1042.
Title
Virginia Resources Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2151ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102717D |