VA HB215 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School Health Services Committee; report. Establishes the School Health Services Committee in the legislative branch to review and provide advice to the General Assembly and other policy makers regarding proposals that require local school boards to offer certain health services in a school setting. The bill requires the Committee to submit its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor by October 1 of each year. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2025, and is identical to
Title
School Health Services Committee; established, membership, report, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB215ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB215ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Robinson, Coyner, Guzman |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Locke, Vogel |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB215H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106212D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106212D-H1 |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101411D |
Same As/Similar To
SB62 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)
SB62 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)
SB62 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)