VA HB2148 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans Services Foundation; powers and duties; appointment of Executive Director; report. Requires the Veterans Services Foundation to provide an annual report on its funding levels and services to the General Assembly. The bill also (i) authorizes the board of trustees of the Foundation to appoint an Executive Director, (ii) clarifies that the Foundation may make direct requests for appropriations from the General Assembly, (iii) clarifies that only the unrestricted portion of the Veterans Services Fund may be used for Foundation expenses, (iv) requires the Department of Veterans Services to provide qualified finance and development personnel to perform the duties of the treasurer and secretary of the Foundation, and (iv) provides that expenditures and disbursements from the Fund shall be made upon written authorization of the Executive Director with the approval of the board of trustees. The bill requires that allocations and expenditures of donated restricted funds be in accordance with cited provisions of the Uniform Prudent Management of Institutional Funds Act relating to the standard of conduct in managing and investing institutional funds.
Title
Veterans Services Foundation; powers and duties, appointment of Executive Director, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2148ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (66-Y 30-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101126D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Armed Forces
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Veterans and Veterans Administration
Armed Forces
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Veterans and Veterans Administration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2715.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2718 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |