VA HB2138 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2138
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Identification privilege cards; fee; confidentiality; penalties. Authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue identification privilege cards to applicants who hold a citizenship or legal presence status that is eligible for a special identification card or a limited-duration special identification card and have reported income from Virginia sources or been claimed as a dependent on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months. The bill provides that identification privilege cards shall be treated as special identification cards unless otherwise provided in the Code of Virginia. The bill limits the release of certain information stored by the Department. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Identification privilege cards; fee; confidentiality; penalties. Authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue identification privilege cards to applicants who hold a citizenship or legal presence status that is eligible for a special identification card or a limited-duration special identification card and have reported income from Virginia sources or been claimed as a dependent on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months. The bill provides that identification privilege cards shall be treated as special identification cards unless otherwise provided in the Code of Virginia. The bill limits the release of certain information stored by the Department. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Identification privilege cards; authorizes DMV to issue, fee, confidentiality, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544) | |
2021-04-07 | House | Enacted, Chapter 544 (effective 1/1/22) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2138ER2) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 41-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (59-Y 41-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2138ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 43-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102728D-E |
2021-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2138E |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment by Delegate Guzman agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102728D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2138 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 411.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 203.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 216.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 323.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 323.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 345.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 600.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |