VA HB2138 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Identification privilege cards; fee; confidentiality; penalties. Authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue identification privilege cards to applicants who hold a citizenship or legal presence status that is eligible for a special identification card or a limited-duration special identification card and have reported income from Virginia sources or been claimed as a dependent on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months. The bill provides that identification privilege cards shall be treated as special identification cards unless otherwise provided in the Code of Virginia. The bill limits the release of certain information stored by the Department. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Identification privilege cards; fee; confidentiality; penalties. Authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue identification privilege cards to applicants who hold a citizenship or legal presence status that is eligible for a special identification card or a limited-duration special identification card and have reported income from Virginia sources or been claimed as a dependent on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months. The bill provides that identification privilege cards shall be treated as special identification cards unless otherwise provided in the Code of Virginia. The bill limits the release of certain information stored by the Department. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identification privilege cards; authorizes DMV to issue, fee, confidentiality, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 43-N)
2021-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 21102728D-E
2021-01-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2138E
2021-01-25HouseAmendment by Delegate Guzman agreed to
2021-01-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-25HouseRead second time
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Transportation with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102728D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242411.3(n/a)See Bill Text
242643(n/a)See Bill Text
462203.2(n/a)See Bill Text
462216.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462323.01(n/a)See Bill Text
462323.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462345.3(n/a)See Bill Text
462346(n/a)See Bill Text
462600.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5813(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2138
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2138+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2138E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2138AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2138F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2138FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1903V0091+HB2138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1903V0101+HB2138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1903V0111+HB2138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H19V0023+HB2138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1082+HB2138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1142+HB2138
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S11V0046+HB2138

Bill Comments

feedback