VA HB2137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Persons who are deaf or hard of hearing; terminology. Replaces the term "hearing impaired" and its variations with "deaf or hard of hearing" and "hearing loss" throughout the Code of Virginia. The bill also renames the Virginia Hearing Impairment Identification and Monitoring System as the Virginia Hearing Loss Identification
Title
Persons who are deaf or hard of hearing; replaces certain terminology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2137ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101301D-E |
2019-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2137E |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101301D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 152.4:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 217.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6528 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 64.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 64.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 342 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 44 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 384.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |