VA HB2132 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local towing advisory board; membership. Requires local towing advisory boards to consist of an equal number of representatives of (i) local law-enforcement agencies, (ii) licensed towing and recovery operators, (iii) commercial property or business owners, including business tenants residing in commercial buildings, and (iv) the general public. Current law requires the membership of such advisory boards to consist of (a) an equal number of representatives of local law-enforcement agencies and licensed towing and recovery operators and (b) one member of the general public.
Title
Towing advisory board, local; membership.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102409D |