VA HB2128 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2128

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sale or transfer of firearms; criminal history record information check delay. Increases from three business days to five business days the time provided for the Department of State Police to complete a background check before a firearm may be transferred. If a dealer who has otherwise fulfilled all requirements is told by the State Police that a response will not be available by the end of the dealer's fifth business day, the dealer may complete the sale or transfer without being deemed in violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, certain; sale, etc., criminal history record information check delay increased to 5 days.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
2021-02-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 31 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021
2021-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-17SenateSigned by President
2021-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2128ER)
2021-02-17HouseEnrolled
2021-02-15SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseReported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102376D

Same As/Similar To

HB2128 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2128
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2128+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2128ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0031+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2128F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2128F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2128FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1501C0004+HB2128
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H15C0008+HB2128
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1200+HB2128
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0152+HB2128
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0015+HB2128
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB2128+HB2128
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0039HB2128+HB2128

Bill Comments

feedback