VA HB2128 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sale or transfer of firearms; criminal history record information check delay. Increases from three business days to five business days the time provided for the Department of State Police to complete a background check before a firearm may be transferred. If a dealer who has otherwise fulfilled all requirements is told by the State Police that a response will not be available by the end of the dealer's fifth business day, the dealer may complete the sale or transfer without being deemed in violation.
Title
Firearms; criminal history record information check delay increased to five days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102376D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2128 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)