VA HB2116 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Certain declared states of emergency; essential workers; funeral service licensees; emergency. Provides that in any case in which the Board of Health or Commissioner of Health has made an emergency order or regulation for the purpose of suppressing nuisances dangerous to the public health or a communicable , contagious, or infectious disease or other danger to the public life and health or the Governor has declared a state of emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat, funeral service licensees and persons employed by a funeral service establishment or by a public medical examination facility shall be considered essential workers and shall be included in any group afforded priority with regard to (i) access to personal protective equipment and (ii) administration of any vaccination against such communicable disease of public health threat during such emergency. The bill contains an emergency clause. Certain declared states of emergency; essential workers; funeral service licensees; emergency. Provides that in any case in which the Board of Health or Commissioner of Health has made an emergency order or regulation for the purpose of suppressing nuisances dangerous to the public health or a communicable , contagious, or infectious disease or other danger to the public life and health or the Governor has declared a state of emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat, funeral service licensees and persons employed by a funeral service establishment or by a public medical examination facility shall be considered essential workers and shall be included in any group afforded priority with regard to (i) access to personal protective equipment and (ii) administration of any vaccination against such communicable disease of public health threat during such emergency. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Declaration of emergency; essential workers, access to personal protective equipment, immunizations.
Sponsors
Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103537D-EH1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amendments HB2116EH1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendments by Delegate Carter agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Substitute by Delegate Mugler agreed to 21103537D-H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee amendments rejected |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | House | Floor substitute printed 21103537D-H1 (Mugler) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102718D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2116 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)