VA HB2101 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health care providers; data collection. Defines "charity care" and "bad debt" as used in the context of certificate of public need, establishes a uniform framework for determining the value of charity care provided, and requires health care providers to report data on (i) the total amount of charity care that the facility provides to indigent persons; (ii) the number of patients to whom charity care is provided; (iii) the specific services delivered to patients that are reported as charity care; and (iv) the portion of the total amount of charity care provided that each service represents. The bill also requires health care providers to report data and information for any parent or subsidiary company of the health care provider that operates in the Commonwealth and requires every hospital that receives a disproportionate share hospital adjustment to report the number of inpatient days attributed to patients eligible for Medicaid but not Medicare Part A and the total amount of the disproportionate share hospital adjustment received. Finally, the bill requires the Commissioner of Health to report to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committees on Finance and Education and Health, by November 1, 2018, a data analysis comparing the value of certain charity care services under various methods of valuation. The bill has a partial delayed effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care providers; data collection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 791 (effective - see bill)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2101ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-27HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2101ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference substitute printed 17105812D-H1
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Barker, Newman
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Byron, Garrett, Price
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-23SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2017-02-22HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 17105563D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2101S1
2017-02-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105563D-S1
2017-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-21SenateRead third time
2017-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateIncorporates HB2225 (Head)
2017-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105563D-S1
2017-02-16SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 17100333D-E
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2101E
2017-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100333D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321102.1(n/a)See Bill Text
321102.2(n/a)See Bill Text
321102.4(n/a)See Bill Text
321276.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2101
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2101+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2101E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2101S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2101H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2101ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2101ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0791+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1203V0010+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0138+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1961+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0266+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB2101+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0788HB2101+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2708+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0895HB2101+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1027HB2101+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2786+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2888+HB2101
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1170HB2101+HB2101

Bill Comments

feedback