VA HB2092 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Application for public assistance; eligibility; review of records. Requires entities processing applications for medical assistance and other public assistance to conduct a review of death records and records relating to incarceration status, employment status, and income of the applicant to determine whether the applicant is eligible for assistance and to review the records of the Virginia Lottery to determine whether the applicant has received any winnings from the Virginia Lottery that may constitute income or resources for purposes of determining eligibility for medical assistance or public assistance. The bill also requires the Department of Social Services to report annually on the types and sources of information reviewed in verifying eligibility and the number of applications for public assistance approved, denied, or referred for investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application for public assistance; eligibility, review of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05House(67 affirmative votes required to override)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (63-Y 33-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (63-Y 33-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2092ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2017-02-24SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (62-Y 32-N)
2017-02-24 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Sturtevant, Black, Petersen
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: LaRock, Orrock, Sickles
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate insisted on amendment (36-Y 3-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenatePassed by for the day
2017-02-17SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2017-02-17SenatePassed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N)
2017-02-17SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-17SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-17SenateRead third time
2017-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-10SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (65-Y 32-N)
2017-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 17103699D-E
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2092E
2017-02-06HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-04HouseRead first time
2017-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 7-N)
2017-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
2017-01-31HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 7-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103699D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
632503(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2092
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2092+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2092E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2092ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1203V0007+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0132+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0206V0019+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0069+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2076+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S09V0080+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0285+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0627HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0663HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0666HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0709HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2610+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0818HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1009HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1012HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1013HB2092+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2765+HB2092
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2863+HB2092

Bill Comments

feedback