VA HB2091 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Barbers and Cosmetology; master estheticians; laser hair removal. Limits the practice of laser hair removal to individuals licensed as master estheticians by the Board for Barbers and Cosmetology. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.
Title
Barbers and Cosmetology, Board for; limits practice of laser hair removal to master estheticians.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in General Laws |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103445D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2091 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2091+hil |