VA HB2085 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; local and interjurisdictional emergency operations plans. Requires local and interjurisdictional agencies to include provisions in their emergency operations plans to ensure that such plans are applied equitably and that the needs of minority and vulnerable communities are met during emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; local and interjurisdictional emergency operations plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-20HouseVOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N)
2021-01-20HouseRead third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-18HouseRead first time
2021-01-15HouseReported from Public Safety (20-Y 1-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102351D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback