VA HB2085 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2085
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; local and interjurisdictional emergency operations plans. Requires local and interjurisdictional agencies to include provisions in their emergency operations plans to ensure that such plans are applied equitably and that the needs of minority and vulnerable communities are met during emergencies.
Title
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; local and interjurisdictional emergency operations plans.
Sponsors
Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 27 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021 | |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2085ER) |
2021-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-15 | House | Reported from Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102351D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2085 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)