VA HB2055 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rural Coastal Virginia Community Enhancement Authority. Establishes the Rural Coastal Virginia Community Enhancement Authority, consisting of the 12 counties within the Northern Neck, Middle Peninsula, and Accomack-Northampton planning districts, if approved by the respective governing bodies. The Authority is created for the purpose of serving as a regional economic development body and represents a partnership of the Commonwealth, the planning districts, and the 12 counties of the coastal region. The Authority shall be governed by a board of up to 15 members. The Authority may seek and approve loans and solicit donations, grants, and any other funding from the Commonwealth, the federal government, and regional, local government, and private entities to carry out its purposes, powers, and duties. Also, the Authority will (i) assist the region in obtaining necessary job training or employment-related education, leadership and civic development, and business development, especially entrepreneurship for the coastal region; (ii) provide special assistance to distressed and underdeveloped counties within the coastal region; and (iii) fund demonstration projects, and conduct research, evaluations, and assessments of the coastal region's assets and needs.
Title
Rural Coastal Virginia Community Enhancement Authority; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2055ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Stuart agreed to |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2055H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104812D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104812D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103874D |