VA HB2045 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Civil action for deprivation of rights; duties and liabilities of certain employers in employing or contracting for the services of law-enforcement officers. Creates a civil action for the deprivation of a person's rights by a law-enforcement officer and provides that a plaintiff may be awarded compensatory damages, punitive damages, and equitable relief as well as reasonable attorney fees and costs. The bill provides that sovereign immunity and limitations on liability or damages shall not apply to such actions and that qualified immunity is not a defense to liability for such deprivation of rights. Finally, the bill provides that any public or private entity that employs or contracts for the services of a law-enforcement officer owes a duty of reasonable care to third parties in its hiring, supervision, training, retention, and use of such officers under its employment or contract.
Title
Civil action for deprivation of rights; duties and liabilities of certain employers.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101696D |