VA HB204 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sale and transfer of firearms; criminal history record information check delay. Decreases from five business days to three business days the time provided for the Department of State Police to complete a background check before a firearm may be transferred. If a dealer who has otherwise fulfilled all requirements is told by the State Police that a response will not be available by the end of the dealer's third business day, the dealer may complete the sale or transfer without being deemed in violation.
Title
Firearms; sale and transfer, criminal history record information check delay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102442D |