VA HB2038 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial motor carriers. Amends several motor carrier and commercial drivers' licensing laws, bringing Virginia into compliance with Federal Motor Carrier Safety Regulations amendments regarding commercial motor vehicles and exemptions regarding certain farm vehicles and their drivers. The bill lowers the age of eligibility for an escort vehicle driver certification from 21 to 18 years. The bill also authorizes two additional circumstances in which law enforcement may remove for-hire license plates: where the carrier's operating authority has expired and where the plates are being used on a leased vehicle, and the bill makes all license plate removal optional at the discretion of the law-enforcement officer.
Title
Commercial motor carriers; amends several commercial drivers' licensing laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 258 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2038ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103511D-E |
2015-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2038E |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103511D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2011.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 324.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.18:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.24:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 348 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 649.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 649.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |