VA HB2037 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Supplementing compensation of public defender. Allows the governing body of any county or city that elects to supplement the compensation of the public defender or any of his deputies to pay such funds directly to the Indigent Defense Commission or to the employees with notice to the Commission of any amount so provided. The bill requires the Commission to provide the funds directly to employees in combination with the compensation fixed by the executive director. Current law requires that such funds be provided directly to the employees, with notice to the Commission of the amount of such funds. Supplementing compensation of public defender. Allows the governing body of any county or city that elects to supplement the compensation of the public defender or any of his deputies to pay such funds directly to the Indigent Defense Commission or to the employees with notice to the Commission of any amount so provided. The bill requires the Commission to provide the funds directly to employees in combination with the compensation fixed by the executive director. Current law requires that such funds be provided directly to the employees, with notice to the Commission of the amount of such funds.
Title
Public defender; supplementing compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467) | |
2023-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 467 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2037ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23106971D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2037S1 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106971D-S1 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106971D-S1 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2037H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105407D-H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105407D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103073D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Criminal Procedure
Local Government and Officials
Public Defenders
Counties Cities and Towns
Criminal Procedure
Local Government and Officials
Public Defenders