VA HB2034 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Attorney General; investigation of complaints. Provides that the Attorney General shall investigate complaints of alleged abuse or neglect of persons in the care or custody of others who receive payments for medical assistance under the state plan for medical assistance, regardless of whether the patient is a recipient of medical assistance. The bill also exempts records or information provided to the Office of the Attorney General's Medicaid Fraud Control Unit from disclosure pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney General; investigation of complaints.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-15 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
2011-03-15 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 110 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-20 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-17 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-17 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2034ER)
2011-02-17 House: Enrolled
2011-02-14 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-14 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-11 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2011-02-10 Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health
2011-01-31 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-01-28 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2011-01-28 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2011-01-27 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2034H1
2011-01-27 House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104552D-H1
2011-01-27 House: Read second time
2011-01-26 House: Read first time
2011-01-25 House: Committee substitute printed 11104552D-H1
2011-01-25 House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102787D

Same As/Similar To

SB1214 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321310(n/a)See Bill Text
321320(n/a)See Bill Text
321321.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback