VA SB1214 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Attorney General; investigation of complaints. Provides that the Attorney General shall investigate complaints of alleged abuse or neglect of persons in the care or custody of others who receive payments for medical assistance under the state plan for medical assistance, regardless of whether the patient is a recipient of medical assistance. The bill also exempts records or information provided to the Office of the Attorney General's Medicaid Fraud Control Unit from disclosure pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Attorney General; investigation of complaints of abuse of person in care of others.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1214ER) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1214S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105080D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105080D-S1 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102887D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2034 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 321.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |