VA HB2024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Condemnation powers and proceedings; notice to owner or tenant. Requires an authorized condemnor or the Commissioner of Highways to give notice to the owner or tenant of freehold property subject to condemnation between 30 and 45 days prior to the filing or recordation of a certificate in any "quick take" condemnation proceeding. Current law requires notice but does not provide a time frame within which such notice must be given. The bill also requires such condemnor to notify the owner or tenant within four business days of the filing or recording by providing a copy of the certificate by certified or registered mail.
Title
Condemnation powers and proceedings; notice to owner or tenant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 563 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2024ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Freitas, Habeeb, Hope |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Petersen, Peake |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105301D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2024S1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105301D-S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105301D-S1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2024H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104805D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104805D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101207D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |