VA HB2023 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB2080-Landes) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB2080-Landes) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; acquisition of voting equipment by localities. Permits localities to acquire direct recording electronic (DRE) machines by deleting the provision enacted in 2007 and later amended that generally prohibited the acquisition of such machines on and after July 1, 2007.
Title
Elections; acquisition of voting equipment by localities on or after July 1, 2011.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB2080-Landes) by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2080-Landes) by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101145D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1490 (Same As) 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB2080-Landes) by voice vote
SB884 (Same As) 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Privileges and Elections
HB2080 (Similar To) 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
SB884 (Same As) 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Privileges and Elections
HB2080 (Similar To) 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2023 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2023+hil |